Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/12/2019 at 01:31:31 (UTC).

SITEONE LANDSCAPE SUPPLY VS WADE, GALEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 SITEONE LANDSCAPE SUPPLY filed an Other lawsuit against WADE, GALEN. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SITEONE LANDSCAPE SUPPLY

Defendants

WADE, GALEN

WADE, MADDIE

Not Classified By Court

F/K/A JOHN DEERE LANDSCAPES IN

MORAN, MADELEINE GUIREY

WADE, MADELEINE

NIGHTSCAPES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOSTO, LAWRENCE MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT MADDIE WADE AKA MADELEINE WADE AKA MADELEINE GUIREY MORAN INDIVIDUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO MADDIE WADE AKA MADELEINE WADE AKA MADELEINE GUIREY MORAN SERVED ON 09/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO MADDIE WADE AKA MADELEINE WADE AKA MADELEINE GUIREY MORAN DBA NIGHTSCAPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO GALEN WADE DBA NIGHTSCAPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Payment received: $320.00 Receipt Number M 437836

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • COMPLAINT-EXHIBITS A-C ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case 602019CC000667CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOSTO , LAWRENCE MICHAEL