This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 15:16:58 (UTC).

SINGH, OSCAR VS SINGH, ZULEICA ROSE

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 SINGH, OSCAR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SINGH, ZULEICA ROSE. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SINGH, OSCAR

Respondent

SINGH, ZULEICA ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOUDREAU, CRAIG ANTHONY

Respondent Attorney

HOBBY, RYAN SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketHUSBAND'S MOTION FOR EX PARTE ORDER COMPELLING WIFES DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketHUSBANDS REQUEST FOR UPDATED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT MANDATORY DISCLOSURES AND DOCUMENTS FROM WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PETITION TO DISESTABLISH PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCLERKS DETERMINATION FOUND INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT/APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS AND CLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DISESTABLISH PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION AND REQUESTING COURT MEDIATION SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $397.50 Receipt Number M 454409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF RECEIPT OF TRANSFER FROM PALM BEACH COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPIES FROM PALM BEACH COUNTY CLERK OF ORDER ON WIFE'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET SHEET FROM PALM BEACH COUNTY, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DOCUMENTS FROM PALM BEACH COUNTY CASE 2019DR002933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase 602020DR000192DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUDREAU , CRAIG ANTHONY