This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 09/07/2020 at 03:03:22 (UTC).

SIMMONS BANK VS BAUMANN, EMILY HURLEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 SIMMONS BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BAUMANN, EMILY HURLEY. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF and HATCHER, MARY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF

HATCHER, MARY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS BANK

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

HURLEY, RACHEL

THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY DEVELOPM

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

CALES, CAROL

HURLEY, NICHOLAS

BAUMANN, EMILY HURLEY

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASQUALONE, JOSHUA DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CHRISTINE A HURLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN PARTY 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF CHRISTINE A HURLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THE VILLAGES COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT NO 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHRISTINE HURLEY REVOCABLE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THE UNKNOWN SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE CHRISTINE HURLEY REVOCABLE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROL CALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO RACHEL HURLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO NICHOLAS HURLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketVERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $2,029.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CA000382CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASQUALONE, JOSHUA D