This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 11/24/2021 at 08:24:18 (UTC).

SHEA, GWEN S, SHEA, MICHAEL D Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 SHEA, GWEN S, SHEA, MICHAEL D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Decedent

SHEA, GWEN S

Not Classified By Court

SHEA, MICHAEL D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SOULSBY, EDWARD WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFIED COPIES TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number M 484947

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATLION BY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY MICHAEL DAVID SHEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase 602021CP000487CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOULSBY, EDWARD WILLIAM