Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/06/2019 at 04:33:09 (UTC).

SEKELY, SYLVIA A VS SEKELY, FREDERICK JR

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 SEKELY, SYLVIA A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SEKELY, FREDERICK JR. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MORLEY, MICHELLE T and BARBARA KISSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

BARBARA KISSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEKELY, SYLVIA A

Respondent

SEKELY, FREDERICK JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 10/24/2019 at 0915 AM, MX - Judge BARBARA KISSNER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • NOTICE FOR FINAL HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FILED BY RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED BY RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • CLERKS DETERMINATION FOUND INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • CLERKS DETERMINATION FOUND INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED BY RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Case 602019DR000512DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less