Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/17/2019 at 03:33:05 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC VS WARFIELD, JAMES

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 SECOND ROUND SUB LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WARFIELD, JAMES. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and PAUL MILITELLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

PAUL MILITELLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC

Defendant

WARFIELD, JAMES

Not Classified By Court

ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

WARFIELD, JAMES M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO JAMES WARFIELD AKA JAMES M WARFIELD SERVED ON 09/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMES WARFIELD AKA JAMES M WARFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL scheduled on 11/1/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • COMPLAINT-EXHIBIT A ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 438097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case 602019SC000675SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Event Date: 11/01/2019 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MX Courtroom C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK PAY is a litigant

Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C