This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/29/2022 at 04:33:20 (UTC).

SANDERLIN, GAIL W VS SANDERLIN, TERRY

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 SANDERLIN, GAIL W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANDERLIN, TERRY. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDERLIN, GAIL W

Respondent

SANDERLIN, TERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHWAM-WILCOX, CAMY BETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TERRY SANDERLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $407.50 Receipt Number M 519559

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $407.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PETITONER DRIVER'S LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NAME CHANGE AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $407.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 602022DR000484DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less