Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/11/2019 at 01:31:05 (UTC).

RSM REPORTS LLC VS MELINOVICH, VERA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 RSM REPORTS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MELINOVICH, VERA. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RSM REPORTS LLC

Defendant

MELINOVICH, VERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT, J CONRAD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST VERA MELINOVICH/DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO VERA MELINOVICH SERVED ON 09/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST VERA MELINOVICH/PROPOSED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO VERA MELINOVICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 437663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Case 602019CC000663CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J CONRAD GRANT, ESQ