Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/12/2019 at 01:31:16 (UTC).

ROBERTS, JENNIFER QUALEY VS ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 ROBERTS, JENNIFER QUALEY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and PAUL MILITELLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

PAUL MILITELLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTS, JENNIFER QUALEY

Defendants

ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

MULLINS, PAULA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 10/10/2019 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT SET FOR 10/10/19 @ 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ANSWER ON TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY PAULA MULLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO PAULA MULLINS FOR ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA SPENSER J MULLINS KELSEY K MULLINS CHRISTOPHER BOND AND DAVID L PATRICK SERVED ON 09/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO PAULA ANN MULLINS SERVED ON 09/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 437864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO PAULA MULLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case 602019CC000666CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Event Date: 10/10/2019 11:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: MX Courtroom C

    Read MoreRead Less