This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 10/08/2022 at 04:35:45 (UTC).

RICHARDSON, THEODORE JAMES VS HICKMAN, CRYSTAL GALE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 RICHARDSON, THEODORE JAMES filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HICKMAN, CRYSTAL GALE. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICHARDSON, THEODORE JAMES

Respondent

HICKMAN, CRYSTAL GALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

INDELICATO, JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

FISHER, JODY LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/30/2022

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketPROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketMOTION FOR EXPEDITED TEMPORARY RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketPETITION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF PATERNITY, SHARED PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY, A PARENTING PLAN AND RELATED RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 520284

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketCase 602022DR000500DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less