This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 12/08/2022 at 03:32:57 (UTC).

REUTEMANN, CYNTHIA Et Al VS HARBORTOWN HOMES INC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 REUTEMANN, CYNTHIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARBORTOWN HOMES INC. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE, MILITELLO, PAUL and MURPHY, VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

MILITELLO, PAUL

MURPHY, VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REUTEMANN, STEPHEN

REUTEMANN, CYNTHIA

Defendant

HARBORTOWN HOMES INC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/22/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/22/2022:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT

11/22/2022:PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

11/22/2022:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO HARBORTOWN HOMES INC / COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

11/22/2022:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO HARBORTOWN HOMES INC / COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON HARBORTOWN HOMES INC

11/30/2022:RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON HARBORTOWN HOMES INC

LETTER FOR RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON HARBORTOWN HOMES INC MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

12/01/2022:LETTER FOR RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON HARBORTOWN HOMES INC MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/19/2023 09:00; Judge: MURPHY, VINCENT; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Courtr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FOR RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON HARBORTOWN HOMES INC MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE ON HARBORTOWN HOMES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $317.00 Receipt Number M 525784

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $317.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO HARBORTOWN HOMES INC / COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $317.00 Balance Remaining $317.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase 602022SC001229SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less