This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 11/10/2019 at 04:31:49 (UTC).

PREYER, MALLORY BARNES VS PREYER, DALE HEATH

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 PREYER, MALLORY BARNES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PREYER, DALE HEATH. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MORLEY, MICHELLE T and BARBARA KISSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

BARBARA KISSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PREYER, MALLORY BARNES

Respondent

PREYER, DALE HEATH

Not Classified By Court

BARNES,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 11/21/2019 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge BARBARA KISSNER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • NOTICE FOR FINAL HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR DALE HEATH PREYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR DALE HEATH PREYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR MALLORY BARNES PREYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR MALLORY BARNES PREYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Payment received: $397.50 Receipt Number M 441373

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED FOR DALE HEATH PREYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED FOR MALLORY BARNES PREYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Case 602019DR000629DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barnes is a litigant