Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 12:05:38 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS DANG, DUONG

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANG, DUONG. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL, PAUL MILITELLO and MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

PAUL MILITELLO

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

DANG, DUONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/13/2020 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Courtr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO DUONG DANG SERVED ON 12/09/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO DUONG DANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL scheduled on 1/13/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 443658

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase 602019SC000871SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ