This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/11/2019 01:30:23

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 a Property - Other Eviction case was filed by PEABODY, DONALD ROY against LOCHER, LISA in the jurisdiction of Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Eviction
  • Jurisdiction Sumter County Courts
  • Judge MILITELLO, PAUL
  • Courthouse Sumter County Courthouse
  • County Sumter
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff PEABODY, DONALD ROY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant LOCHER, LISA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION APPOINTING COURT MEDIATION SERVICES SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND ASSESSING MEDIATION FEE
  • 07/02/2019
  • Payment received: $12.00 Receipt Number M 431748
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 5 Total Assessed $12.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/02/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 431745
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 4 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 5 assessed at sum $12.00
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $400.00
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $25.50 Receipt Number M 431645
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $25.50 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $25.50
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $1,200.00 Receipt Number M 431644
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $1,200.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $1,200.00
  • 06/21/2019
  • ANSWER ON TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY LISA K LOCHER
  • 06/18/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO LISA LOCHER SERVED ON 06/17/19
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 430451
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO LISA LOCHER
  • 06/17/2019
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.