This case was last updated from Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/02/2022 at 03:10:59 (UTC).

PASLER, KAREN V VS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 PASLER, KAREN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NIMETH, JASON J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NIMETH, JASON J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASLER, KAREN V

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONROE, KATIE S

Defendant Attorney

PAUL, MELISSA MORGAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

08/09/2022:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON AUGUST 18 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 517235

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CA000392CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul, Melissa Morgan