Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/13/2019 at 05:32:32 (UTC).

ORLOVE, MYRA D, ORLOVE, WILLIAM S Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 ORLOVE, MYRA D, ORLOVE, WILLIAM S was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORLOVE, MYRA D

Decedent

ORLOVE, WILLIAM S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAPES, DANIEL KARL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket*ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $235.00 Receipt Number M 442837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $235.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CP000831CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Capes, Daniel Karl