Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/13/2019 at 05:31:21 (UTC).

OLIVER, RICHARD JOSEPH, STREET, STEPHANIE A Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 OLIVER, RICHARD JOSEPH, STREET, STEPHANIE A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

STREET, STEPHANIE A

Decedent

OLIVER, RICHARD JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BARSKI, KATHERINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFIED COPIES TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • *ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH (**ORIGINAL**)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • LETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • EFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Payment received: $406.00 Receipt Number M 437964

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $406.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF STEPHANIE A. STREET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $406.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Case 602019CP000686CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARSKI KATHERINE A