Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/14/2019 at 01:31:15 (UTC).

NHC FL 123 LLC Et Al VS SCHEIBER, SHERRI

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 NHC FL 123 LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SCHEIBER, SHERRI. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NHC FL 124 LLC

NHC FL 123 LLC

Defendant

SCHEIBER, SHERRI

Not Classified By Court

SCHEIBER, SHERRI L.

RED OAKS RV RESORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

CHASE, BRIAN CHRISTIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO SHERRI SCHEIBER AKA SHERRI L SCHEIBER SERVED ON 12/03/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR EVICTION ISSUED TO SHERRI SCHEIBER AKA SHERRI L SCHEIBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 442946

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT-B THREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT-A RV PLACEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CC000852CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NHC FL 124 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHASE BRIAN C