This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 02/06/2022 at 03:05:20 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS AUSTIN, BRIAN LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AUSTIN, BRIAN LEE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALLMAN, WILLIAM HENRY III and HALLMAN, WILLIAM H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALLMAN, WILLIAM HENRY III

HALLMAN, WILLIAM H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS IN THE ESTAT

AUSTIN, BRIAN LEE

Not Classified By Court

ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS IN THE ESTATE OF WAYNE S AUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON BRIAN LEE AUSTIN SERVED ON JANUARY 24 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON JOCELYN FIGUEROA FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA SERVED ON JANUARY 19 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS IN THE ESTATE OF WAYNE S AUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BRIAN LEE AUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number M 499933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $945.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702 0154 CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CA000014CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ACTING TRUSTEE OF THE NORMAN RICHARD MICHAELSON TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan