This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 08:27:03 (UTC).

MULLINS, CHRISTINA LOUISE VS MULLINS, LARRY ALLEN JR

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 MULLINS, CHRISTINA LOUISE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MULLINS, LARRY ALLEN JR. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MORLEY, MICHELLE T and BRENDA COLEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

BRENDA COLEMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MULLINS, CHRISTINA LOUISE

Respondent

MULLINS, LARRY ALLEN JR

Not Classified By Court

HUNTER,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REASSIGNMENT REMOVED FROM UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION OF PARENT EDUCATION AND FAMILY STABILIZATION PROGRAM FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.50 Receipt Number M 451178

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 8 Total Assessed $10.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 8 assessed at sum $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION TO MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $4.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase 602019DR000680DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hunter is a litigant