This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:07:11 (UTC).

MOOTY, HANNAH MARIE VS RICHARDSON, VICTOR NEIL III

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 MOOTY, HANNAH MARIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RICHARDSON, VICTOR NEIL III. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOOTY, HANNAH MARIE

Respondent

RICHARDSON, VICTOR NEIL III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

MILLER, KATE S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketHUSBANDS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF VICTOR RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND ANSWERS TO STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketWIFES ANSWER TO HUSBANDS COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $295.00 Receipt Number M 455614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $295.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketINVOICE TO ATTORNEY MILLER FOR COUNTERPETITION FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FLORIDA DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase 602020DR000119DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less