This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 06/08/2019 03:03:31

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 a Probate - Other Probate case was filed by MILLHORN, MICHAEL D against MCDONOUGH, CAROLYN LOMBARDI in the jurisdiction of Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 05/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Probate - Other Probate
  • Jurisdiction Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County
  • Judge JERALD, R GREGG
  • Courthouse Sumter County Courthouse
  • County Sumter
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant MCDONOUGH, CAROLYN LOMBARDI
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff MILLHORN, MICHAEL D
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
  • 05/20/2019
  • LETTER FROM ATTORNEY
  • 05/16/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 427807
  • 05/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 05/15/2019
  • PETITION TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
  • 05/15/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 05/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00
  • 05/15/2019
  • Case 602019CA000203CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/15/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.