Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 05:32:21 (UTC).

MILLHORN, ERIC C, NEIMAN, CONRAD VICTOR Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 MILLHORN, ERIC C, NEIMAN, CONRAD VICTOR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Decedent

NEIMAN, CONRAD VICTOR

Not Classified By Court

MILLHORN, ERIC C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MILLHORN, ERIC C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 443410

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT REGARDING TRUST BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION/APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CP000850CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLHORN, ERIC C.