This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 11/22/2021 at 06:43:54 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC VS LANCASTER, DENISE W

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LANCASTER, DENISE W. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE and MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

LANCASTER, DENISE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

06/07/2021:REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/02/2021 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Courtr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE-NO AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 02 2021 AT 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/16/2021 10:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON DENISE W LANCASTER SERVED ON JUNE 17 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO DENISE W LANCASTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 483751

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase 602021SC000536SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/7/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B