Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/12/2019 at 01:31:27 (UTC).

MHC PARKWOOD COMMUNITIES LLC VS GALLETTO, FERNANDO JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 MHC PARKWOOD COMMUNITIES LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GALLETTO, FERNANDO JR. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MHC PARKWOOD COMMUNITIES LLC

Defendants

GALLETTO, FERNANDO JR

WEAVER, ANTOINETT

Not Classified By Court

FERDINAND GALLETTO, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN, STANLEY L.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO ANTOINETT WEAVER

09/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO ANTOINETT WEAVER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO FERNANDO GALLETTO JR AKA FERDINAND GALLETTO JR

09/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO FERNANDO GALLETTO JR AKA FERDINAND GALLETTO JR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • MEMORANDUM FROM FAMILY & COURT SERVICES LLC TO CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO ANTOINETT WEAVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO FERNANDO GALLETTO JR AKA FERDINAND GALLETTO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 437840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • COMPLAINT-EXHIBIT A ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case 602019CC000668CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Stanley L