Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 08:38:47 (UTC).

MCKEEVER, JOHN J, MCKEEVER, MARGARET A Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 MCKEEVER, JOHN J, MCKEEVER, MARGARET A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCKEEVER, MARGARET A

Decedent

MCKEEVER, JOHN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SOULSBY, EDWARD WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFIED COPIES TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $3.00 Receipt Number M 458594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 Total Assessed $3.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY REQUESTING CERTIFIED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFIED COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $3.00 Receipt Number M 453028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 Total Assessed $3.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY REQUESTING CERTIFIED COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCOPY AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 443583

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CP000854CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOULSBY, EDWARD WILLIAM