This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 11/24/2021 at 08:16:57 (UTC).

MCEWEN, KELLY M, PHENIS, ARTHUR L II Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 MCEWEN, KELLY M, PHENIS, ARTHUR L II was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Claimant

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Decedent

PHENIS, ARTHUR L II

Not Classified By Court

MCEWEN, KELLY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SWIGERT, BRETT LEWIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY WITH ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY ANDREW M VORICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY ANN M JUBA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM BANK OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY BANK OF AMERICA N A IN AMOUNT OF 5 768 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION BY CHARLES MURPHY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 484965

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE OF LORALEE ANN PHENIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase 602021CP000512CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWIGERT, BRETT LEWIS