This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 09/12/2020 at 03:04:49 (UTC).

MARIA L PANZA AS TRUSTEE Et Al VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 MARIA L PANZA AS TRUSTEE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF and HATCHER, MARY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF

HATCHER, MARY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PANZA, MARIE L

MARIA L PANZA AS TRUSTEE

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATZ, ERIC MAX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2 5 16 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ATTORNEY ALEXANDER D KOCHMAN ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 461644

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF AMANDA SLATER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO RULE 1 310b6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CA000390CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katz, Eric M