This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/30/2022 at 05:36:15 (UTC).

MADDEN, DANIEL F., MADDEN, DANIEL FRANCIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 MADDEN, DANIEL F , MADDEN, DANIEL FRANCIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Decedent

MADDEN, DANIEL FRANCIS

Not Classified By Court

MADDEN, THOMAS FRANCES

MADDEN, DANIEL F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SHANAWANY, HISHAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 519533

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CP000873CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less