Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/17/2019 at 05:30:37 (UTC).

KEMP, LINDA ANN, TALBOT, WENDY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 KEMP, LINDA ANN, TALBOT, WENDY L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

TALBOT, WENDY L

Decedent

KEMP, LINDA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MILLHORN, ERIC C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 438147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT REGARDING TRUST BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION/APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case 602019CP000693CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLHORN, ERIC C.