This case was last updated from Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/19/2022 at 03:04:44 (UTC).

HECK, BILLY Et Al VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 06/25/2022 HECK, BILLY filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE. This case was filed in Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NIMETH, JASON J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NIMETH, JASON J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HECK, BILLY

HECK, LISA

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOLLEY, JOHN ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

KATZ, ALYSSA LENORE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/25/2022:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDAS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AND FIELD ADJUSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 513590

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CA000317CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN ANDREW TOLLEY II