Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/05/2019 at 01:31:39 (UTC).

HALLMARK GROUP MANAGEMENT INC VS GALE STROUD, CASANDRA

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 HALLMARK GROUP MANAGEMENT INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GALE STROUD, CASANDRA. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALLMARK GROUP MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

GALE STROUD, CASANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL GEORGE F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DEFAULT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ENTERED AGAINST CASANDRA GALE-STROUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO RYAN ROBINSON FOR CASANDRA GALE-STROUD SERVED ON 09/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • ANSWER ON TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY CASANDRA GALE-STROUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO CASANDRA GALE-STROUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 437390

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION-EXHIBITS A & B ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Case 602019CC000652CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS