This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 09/05/2020 at 03:01:46 (UTC).

GEE, DAVID E VS GARNER, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 GEE, DAVID E filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against GARNER, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF and HATCHER, MARY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF

HATCHER, MARY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEE, DAVID E

Defendant

GARNER, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAIRD, BRIAN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

SHOEMAKER, JOSEPH CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY JOSEPH C SHOEMAKER ON BEHALF OF WILLIAM GARNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM GARNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2 516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY BRIAN LAIRD ON BEHALF OF DAVID E GEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 461689

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CA000393CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAIRD, BRIAN JOSEPH