Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/12/2019 at 01:31:46 (UTC).

FRASCATI CAT LLC VS PATTERSON, CHIQUITA

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 FRASCATI CAT LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PATTERSON, CHIQUITA. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRASCATI CAT LLC

Defendant

PATTERSON, CHIQUITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO CHIQUITA PATTERSON FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED ON 10/01/19 AND GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF ON 10/02/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT-EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST CHIQUITA PATTERSON/DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TO CHIQUITA PETTERSON SERVED ON 09/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO CHIQUITA PATTERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 437790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case 602019CC000665CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less