This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 15:39:46 (UTC).

ELLIS, DEANNA F, ELLIS, RICHARD E Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 ELLIS, DEANNA F, ELLIS, RICHARD E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

ELLIS, RICHARD E

Decedent

ELLIS, DEANNA F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LINN, KATHRYN ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED ON DEANNA F ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $6.00 Receipt Number M 455978

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY ENCLOSING DOCUMENTS AND REQUESTING CERTIFIED COPIES SEE CASE ALERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket*ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED ON DEANNA F ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY TO CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 455610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CP000309CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINN, KATHRYN ELIZABETH