Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 08:28:09 (UTC).

EICHAKER, BRIDGET MARY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 EICHAKER, BRIDGET MARY was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EICHAKER, BRIDGET MARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF CERTIFICATE OF MARRIAGE FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF CERTIFICATE OF MARRIAGE FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE REQUIRING COMPLIANCE PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR REPORT OF LEGAL NAME CHANGE (BVS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR REPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE FOR FINAL HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF SOCIAL SECURITY CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 443710

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase 602019DR000674DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less