This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/20/2022 at 04:32:07 (UTC).

DUKE, RACHEL CECILA VS DUDLEY, MATTHEW ADDISON

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 DUKE, RACHEL CECILA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DUDLEY, MATTHEW ADDISON. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUKE, RACHEL CECILA

Respondent

DUDLEY, MATTHEW ADDISON

Not Classified By Court

SCHRAM, RACHEL CECILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

INDELICATO, JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUANCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO MATTHEW ADDISON DUDLEY ON 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPROTECTIVE INJUNCTION WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDESIGATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITON FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 602022DR000483DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less