Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/14/2019 at 04:31:42 (UTC).

DUKE, HEATH IAN VS DUKE, RACHEL CECILA

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 DUKE, HEATH IAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUKE, RACHEL CECILA. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MORLEY, MICHELLE T and BARBARA KISSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

BARBARA KISSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUKE, HEATH IAN

Respondent

DUKE, RACHEL CECILA

Not Classified By Court

SCHRAM,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR RACHEL DUKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR RACHEL DUKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR RACHEL DUKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 10/24/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge BARBARA KISSNER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • NOTICE REQUIRING COMPLIANCE PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DEMOGRAPHIC SHEET FOR BVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • NOTICE FOR FINAL HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Payment received: $397.50 Receipt Number M 438015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • PROOF OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case 602019DR000534DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less