Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/13/2019 at 05:32:36 (UTC).

DOY, DAVID S, DOY, JOAN M Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 DOY, DAVID S, DOY, JOAN M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOY, DAVID S

Decedent

DOY, JOAN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PITTMAN, AMY REED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Payment received: $4.00 Receipt Number M 438796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • *ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • LETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FORMAL NOTICE TO ACS-TPL RECOVERY UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • EFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 437841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Case 602019CP000682CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PITTMAN, AMY REED