This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/30/2022 at 05:35:48 (UTC).

DOWLING, DOUGLAS J, DOWLING, JOHN E Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 DOWLING, DOUGLAS J, DOWLING, JOHN E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOWLING, DOUGLAS J

Decedent

DOWLING, JOHN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWIGERT, BRETT LEWIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PERSONAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number M 520038

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE TRAE JOE MAXWELL OWEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATION OF HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY AND DETERMINATION OF EXEMPT PERSONAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 519449

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CP000870CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less