Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/06/2019 at 05:30:23 (UTC).

DANFORD, SHARI K, LEWIS, KENNETH DONALD Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 DANFORD, SHARI K, LEWIS, KENNETH DONALD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

DANFORD, SHARI K

Decedent

LEWIS, KENNETH DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JOZSI, CARLOS XAVIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFIED COPIES TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Payment received: $12.00 Receipt Number M 438798

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $12.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • LETTER FROM ATTORNEY - REQUESTING COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT/CODICIL RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • OATH OF WITNESS TO WILL BY BARBARA SHINSKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • LETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • WAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION -KIM T. GASPAROVICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • WAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION-SHARI K. DANFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT -SHARI K. DANFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT -KIM T. GASPAROVICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • OATH OF WITNESS TO WILL BY BARBARA SHINSKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AND ESTABLISHMENT AND PROBATE OF LOST OR DESTROYED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Case 602019CP000671CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOZSI, CARLOS XAVIER