Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County on 05/08/2021 at 03:01:09 (UTC).

DACOSTA, CELESTE Et Al VS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 DACOSTA, CELESTE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF and HATCHER, MARY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Sumter County

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF

HATCHER, MARY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DACOSTA, CELESTE

DACOSTA, THOMAS

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF, GRANT WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

PAUL, MELISSA MORGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON MAY 3 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORPS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING A CORRESPONDENCE DATED APRIL 15 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2 516b1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase 602021CA000196CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul, Melissa Morgan