Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 05:30:31 (UTC).

CURTIS, JEFFREY, CURTIS, KERRY J Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 CURTIS, JEFFREY, CURTIS, KERRY J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CURTIS, KERRY J

Decedent

CURTIS, JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WADE, JAMES EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 443413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 602019CP000851CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADE, JAMES EDWARD