This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:14:48 (UTC).

CRUM, ILENE PATRICIA, HARRIS, LESLIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 CRUM, ILENE PATRICIA, HARRIS, LESLIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARRIS, LESLIE

Claimant

TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING

Decedent

CRUM, ILENE PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELYAMAN, SARAH KASSEM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM DCM SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY BB T IN AMOUNT OF 5 693 85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 451944

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCase 602020CP000174CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Branch Banking and Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELYAMAN , SARAH KASSEM