Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 10/10/2019 at 03:31:25 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC VS PICARIELLO, REBECCA L

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PICARIELLO, REBECCA L. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL and PAUL MILITELLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

PAUL MILITELLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

Defendant

PICARIELLO, REBECCA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • LETTER FOR RETURN OF NON SERVICE ON REBECCA PICARIELLO MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • RETURN OF NON SERVICE TO REBECCA PICARIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO REBECCA PICARIELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL scheduled on 11/1/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 437600

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Case 602019SC000661SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Event Date: 11/01/2019 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MX Courtroom C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S