This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/30/2022 at 05:36:35 (UTC).

COMPLE, DEAN, COMPLE, DEAN A Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 COMPLE, DEAN, COMPLE, DEAN A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COMPLE, DEAN

Decedent

SIRIANI, JEAN T

Not Classified By Court

COMPLE, DEAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHANAWANY, HISHAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketJOINDER/WAIVER AND CONSENT SIGN BY PATRICIA VALVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketJOINDER/WAIVER AND CONSENT SIGN BY DANIEL VALVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE TO AHCA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketJOINDER/WAIVER AND CONSENT DEAN COMPLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO THOMAS VALVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO PATRICIA VALVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO DONALD COMPLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO DEAN COMPLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO DANIEL VALVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO CAROLYN WARREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PAID FUNERAL BILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 519591

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CP000875CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less