This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/30/2022 at 05:36:06 (UTC).

COLEMAN, MARIE, FERRARA, PASQUALE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 COLEMAN, MARIE, FERRARA, PASQUALE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORLEY, MICHELLE T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORLEY, MICHELLE T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLEMAN, MARIE

Decedent

FERRARA, PASQUALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWIGERT, BRETT LEWIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY WITH ENCLOSURES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE BY ANTHONY FERRARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER STEPEN MOSCATELLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Docket*ORIGINAL* LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DEPOSITED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DETERMINATIO OF HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY AND DETERMINATION OF EXEMPT PERSONAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEFILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $235.00 Receipt Number M 519531

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $235.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 602022CP000872CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less