Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sumter County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 12:02:12 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS DILLARD, KAREN L

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DILLARD, KAREN L. This case was filed in Sumter County Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL, PAUL MILITELLO and MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sumter County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sumter County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL

PAUL MILITELLO

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

DILLARD, KAREN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/13/2020 09:00; Judge: MILITELLO, PAUL; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE Courtr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS ISSUED TO KAREN L DILLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL scheduled on 1/13/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL MILITELLO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 443729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase 602019SC000874SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.