This case was last updated from Sumter County Florida Courts on 09/16/2023 at 01:13:54 (UTC).

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P VS WATERS, LAKISHA M

Case Summary

On 06/30/2023 WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WATERS, LAKISHA M. This case was filed in Sumter County Florida Courts, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE and MILITELLO, PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILITELLO, PAUL LOUIE

MILITELLO, PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDWOOD PRESERVE INVESTMENT P

Defendant

WATERS, LAKISHA M

Not Classified By Court

WILDWOOD PRESERVE APARTMENT HO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, BARRY B

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

06/30/2023:PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

06/30/2023:REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

06/30/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO LAKISHA M WATERS

07/03/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO LAKISHA M WATERS

RETURN OF SERVICE TO LAKISHA M WATERS SERVED ON JULY 07 2023

07/11/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE TO LAKISHA M WATERS SERVED ON JULY 07 2023

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST LAKISHA M WATERS

07/17/2023:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST LAKISHA M WATERS

PROPOSED DEFAULT

07/17/2023:PROPOSED DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST LAKISHA M WATERS

07/19/2023:DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST LAKISHA M WATERS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

07/20/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT O POSSESSION

07/27/2023:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT O POSSESSION

PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

07/31/2023:PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

08/01/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED ON AUGUST 11 2023 AND GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF ON AUGUST 14 2023

08/16/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED ON AUGUST 11 2023 AND GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF ON AUGUST 14 2023

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION POSTED ON AUGUST 11 2023 AND GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF ON AUGUST 14 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT O POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST LAKISHA M WATERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST LAKISHA M WATERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO LAKISHA M WATERS SERVED ON JULY 07 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR EVICTION TO LAKISHA M WATERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 546405

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketCase 602023CC000697CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less