This case was last updated from Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/12/2019 at 01:07:00 (UTC).

DAME, DANIELLE R VS MOELLER TRUCKING INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 DAME, DANIELLE R filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOELLER TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in Sumter County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Sumter County Courthouse located in Sumter, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HALLMAN, WILLIAM H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sumter, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HALLMAN, WILLIAM H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAME, DANIELLE R

Defendants

MOELLER TRUCKING INC

OLWINE, ANTHONY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, CHRISLIE

Defendant Attorney

CRUMPTON, MARC M.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/06/2015:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

03/14/2016

DocketCase Status set to CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2016

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2015

DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DANIELLE R DAME AND JAKE CORDERO SET FOR 12/17/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2015

DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE TO RECORDS CUSTODIAN FOR BUNN PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015

DocketDEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2015

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT - ANTHONY J OLWINE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2015

DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT - MOELLER TRUCKING INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2015

DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO ALL PARTIES LISTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2015

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO STACIE CARTER FOR RECORDS CUSTODIAN FOR LAKESIDE CENTER FOR WOMEN SERVED ON 11/06/15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2015

DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
07/06/2015

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2015

DocketCase 602015CA000224CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less